This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/23/2019 at 02:37:16 (UTC).

Dectective Daniel Peters vs Gregory James Bond

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Dectective Daniel Peters filed an Other lawsuit against Gregory James Bond. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************2718

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Detective Daniel Peters

Respondent

Bond, Gregory James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2019

DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2019

DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Detective Daniel Peters. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019

DocketThe Court Orders the Gun Violence Restraining Order After Hearing Granted on 03/15/2019. See Order filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019

DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019

DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Gun Violence Restraining Order held on 03/15/2019 11:00 AM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019

DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Gun Violence Restraining Order held on March 15, 2019. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2019

DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Dectective Daniel Peters. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019

DocketNotice of Court Hearing - GVRO filed by Dectective Daniel Peters. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2019

DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Gun Violence Restraining Order set for 3/15/2019 at 11:00 AM Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department M2. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2019

DocketTemporary Gun Violence Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/22/2019. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2019

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dectective Daniel Peters. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2019

DocketPetition for Gun Violence Restraining Order filed by Dectective Daniel Peters. Action Type: Petition for Gun Violence Restraining Order; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2019

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less