This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:46:39 (UTC).

Deborah Patterson vs Adrian Lee Tyson

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Deborah Patterson filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Adrian Lee Tyson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1903

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patterson, Deborah

Defendant

Tyson, Adrian Lee

 

Court Documents

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Deborah Patterson filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 4000.00 and Cost 65.00 FW, set for 06/22/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Certified Mail

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Adrian Lee Tyson. Costs returned unclaimed Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Request for Certified mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by Patterson, Deborah as to Adrian Lee Tyson. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Patterson, Deborah. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 4000.00 and Cost 65.00, set for 10/26/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 4000.00 and Cost 65.00, set for 10/26/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Adrian Lee Tyson. Costs returned unclaimed Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 4000.00 and Cost 65.00 FW, set for 06/22/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by Patterson, Deborah as to Adrian Lee Tyson. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/29/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. principal 4000.00 fw costs 50.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Deborah Patterson filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Patterson, Deborah. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less