This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 18:20:18 (UTC).

Deborah Hanna vs Sandra M Vargas

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 Deborah Hanna filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Sandra M Vargas. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4154

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hanna, Deborah

Respondent

Vargas, Sandra M

 

Court Documents

CivilRestrainingOrderNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hanna, Deborah.

CH100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Hanna, Deborah.

CH109 Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Deborah Hanna.

CH110 TP Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 05/25/2022.

CH200 TP Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to Sandra M Vargas served on 06/01/2022 by Personal Service. .

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service filed by Hanna, Deborah.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 06/15/2022 10:30 AM .

CH130 TP Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing

The Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Entered on 06/15/2022. See Order filed herein.

 

Docket Entries

06/15/2022

HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketThe Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Entered on 06/15/2022. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 06/15/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on June 15, 2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Unsuccessful Service filed by Hanna, Deborah.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Proof of Service as to Sandra M Vargas served on 06/01/2022 by Personal Service. .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022

DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 06/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 05/25/2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Deborah Hanna.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Hanna, Deborah.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hanna, Deborah.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less