This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/01/2022 at 02:19:42 (UTC).

David Weaver et al. vs Cheyenne Arias et al.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 David Weaver filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cheyenne Arias. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger and Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1475

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Weaver, Karen

Weaver, David

Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc.

Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc

Defendants

Hoscheid, Matthew

Arias, Cheyenne

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Arias, Cheyenne

Hoscheid, Mathew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Connolly, Mark V

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Rasmussen, Dennis

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

06/02/2021: Notice to Filing Party

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hoscheid, Matthew; Arias, Cheyenne.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Weaver, David; Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc.; Weaver, Karen.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

05/15/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Weaver, Karen; Weaver, David; Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Weaver, David; Weaver, Karen.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Cross-defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of special motion to strike portions of cross-complaint as a meritless SLAPP and by motion to strike filed by Weaver, Karen; Weaver, David; Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc.

Amendment to Complaint

First Amendment to Complaint filed by Weaver, David; Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc.; Weaver, Karen.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Cheyenne Arias (Cross-Complainant); Cheyenne Arias (Defendant); Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc (Cross-Defendant); Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc. (Plaintiff); David Weaver (Cross-Defendant); David Weaver (Plaintiff); Karen Weaver (Cross-Defendant); Karen Weaver (Plaintiff); Mathew Hoscheid (Cross-Complainant); Matthew Hoscheid (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Cheyenne Arias (Defendant); Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc. (Plaintiff); David Weaver (Plaintiff); Karen Weaver (Plaintiff); Matthew Hoscheid (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial (est 3 days), set for 11/21/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/17/2021 08:30 AM .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 17, 2021.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Hoscheid, Matthew; Arias, Cheyenne.; Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Weaver, David; Weaver, Karen.; Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Strike; Court Room: 11B; Result: Dropped; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc (Cross-Defendant); David Weaver (Cross-Defendant); Karen Weaver (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order filed by Weaver, David; Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc.; Weaver, Karen.; Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amendment to Complaint filed by Weaver, David; Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc.; Weaver, Karen.; Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/17/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B.; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Weaver, Karen; Weaver, David.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Mark V Connolly, retained for Commercial Maintenance & Renovations Inc. .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Mark V Connolly, retained for Karen Weaver .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Mark V Connolly, retained for David Weaver .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Weaver, Karen; Weaver, David.; Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received by David Weaver in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 622736.; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Ross, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASMUSSEN, DENNIS