This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/23/2023 at 02:25:54 (UTC).

David Tafoya, vs Varni Brothers Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 David Tafoya, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Varni Brothers Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3066

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Tafoya, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant

Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bass, Daniel J.

Defendant Attorney

Purcell, Brooke S.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Varni Brothers Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's First Through Third Causes of Action filed by Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference, set for 08/25/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Varni Brothers Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's First Through Third Causes of Action filed by Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 01/27/2021 09:00 AM .

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Poitns and Authorities in Support of Defendant Varni Brothers Corporation's Ex Parte Application for an Immediate and Mandatory Stay Under Code of Civ. Proc. 1281.4 filed by Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation.

Supplemental Brief

Defendant Varni Brothers Corporation's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's First Through Third Causes of Action filed by Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation.

Motion to Compel

Defendant Varni brothers Corporation's notice of motion and motion to compel arbitration and stay of proceedings filed by Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 04/26/2021 08:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Status Hearing held on 05/12/2023 08:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/08/2022 08:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/11/2022 08:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 02/10/2022 08:30 AM .

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order Re: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Tenth Cause of Action and Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings entered and filed.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 11/30/2021 08:30 AM .

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing on Defendant Varni Brothers Corporation's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings to Plaintiff David Tafoya's Tenth Cause of Action for Civil Penalties Under PAGA filed by Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Varni Brothers Corporation's Motion for Judgment on The Pleading to Plaintiff David Tafoya's Tenth Cause of Action for Civil Penalties Under PAGA filed by Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation.

Motion

Defendant Varni Brothers Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings to Plaintiff David Tafoya's Tenth Cause of Action for Civil Penalties Under PAGA filed by Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation.

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/03/2024

HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2024

HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketPayment received by individually, David Tafoya in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 837087.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial Estimate 5 days, set for 05/06/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 06/03/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

HearingHearing Type: Status Hearing; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Status Hearing held on 05/12/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketHearing re: Status Hearing held on May 12, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022

DocketHearing regarding: Status Hearing Status of Class Certification, set for 05/12/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022

HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; David Tafoya, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated (Plaintiff); Varni Brothers Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
112 More Docket Entries
03/02/2020

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/01/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketComplex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by David Tafoya, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by David Tafoya, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by David Tafoya, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketPayment received by individually, David Tafoya in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 541950.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketPayment received by individually, David Tafoya in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 541950.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketAttorney, Daniel J. Bass, retained for David Tafoya, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated .; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less