This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:21 (UTC).

David Knipp et al. vs Paramjit Singh Thind et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 David Knipp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Paramjit Singh Thind. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1887

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Knipp, David

Knipp, Debbie

Defendants

Thind, Paramjit Singh

Thind, Richie

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service as to Paramjit Singh Thind (Certified Mail). Not signed by named defendant. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/22/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by Knipp, Debbie 198 S. Dulce St.; Knipp, David as to Paramjit Singh Thind. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service as to Richie Thind (Certified Mail). Not signed by named defendant. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by Knipp, Debbie 198 S. Dulce St.; Knipp, David as to Richie Thind Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Knipp, Debbie 198 S. Dulce St.; Knipp, David. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 22, 2016. Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/22/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Paramjit Singh Thind (Certified Mail). Not signed by named defendant. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Richie Thind (Certified Mail). Not signed by named defendant. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/22/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. principal 75.00 costs 105.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by Knipp, Debbie 198 S. Dulce St.; Knipp, David as to Richie Thind Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $15.00. Receipt number 34382. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $90.00. Receipt number 34379. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Knipp, Debbie 198 S. Dulce St.; Knipp, David. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by Knipp, Debbie 198 S. Dulce St.; Knipp, David as to Paramjit Singh Thind. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $90.00. Receipt number 34379. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less