This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:57:49 (UTC).

David Haire et al. vs Prabhjit S. Purewal, M.D. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 David Haire filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Prabhjit S Purewal, M D. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2034

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Haire, David

Haire, Cathy

Defendants

Ban Dune Marketing, Inc.

Richards Pharma, LTD

Richards Services

Warwick Healthcare Solutions Inc.

Prabhjit S. Purewal, M.D.

Prabhjit S. Purewal, M.D., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baghdadi, Khaldoun A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to David Haire, Cathy Haire, Prabhjit S. Purewal, M.D., Prabhjit S. Purewal, M.D., Inc., Warwick Healthcare Solutions Inc., Richards Pharma, LTD, Richards Services, Ban Dune Marketing, Inc. Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2016
  • Case status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to David Haire, Cathy Haire, Prabhjit S. Purewal, M.D., Prabhjit S. Purewal, M.D., Inc., Warwick Healthcare Solutions Inc., Richards Pharma, LTD, Richards Services, Ban Dune Marketing, Inc. Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/29/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 35542. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Khaldoun A. Baghdadi, retained for Cathy Haire . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Khaldoun A. Baghdadi, retained for David Haire . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less