This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:27 (UTC).

David Haire et al. vs Prabhjit S Purewal, MD et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 David Haire filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Prabhjit S Purewal, MD. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1888

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Haire, David

Haire, Cathy

Defendants

Ban Dune Marketing, Inc.

Purewal, MD, Prabhjit S

Richards Pharma

Richards Services

Prabhjit S. Purewal, MD, Inc.

Warwick Healthcare Solutions Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baghdadi, Khaldoun A.

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action as to David Haire, Cathy Haire, Prabhjit S Purewal, MD, Prabhjit S. Purewal, MD, Inc., Warwick Healthcare Solutions Inc., Richards Pharma, Richards Services, Ban Dune Marketing, Inc. Entered. Parties waive right to file malicious prosecution action. Each side to bear own costs and fees. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Prabhjit S. Purewal, MD, Inc.; Purewal, MD, Prabhjit S. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/23/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Prabhjit S. Purewal, MD, Inc.; Purewal, MD, Prabhjit S. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Case status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action as to David Haire, Cathy Haire, Prabhjit S Purewal, MD, Prabhjit S. Purewal, MD, Inc., Warwick Healthcare Solutions Inc., Richards Pharma, Richards Services, Ban Dune Marketing, Inc. Entered. Parties waive right to file malicious prosecution action. Each side to bear own costs and fees. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 45571. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/23/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34390. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Haire, David; Haire, Cathy. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Khaldoun A. Baghdadi, retained for Cathy Haire . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Khaldoun A. Baghdadi, retained for David Haire . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less