This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 20:37:16 (UTC).

David Braga vs. Scott Phillip Hamilton

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 David Braga filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Scott Phillip Hamilton. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7170

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Braga, David

Reavis, Kimberly

Reavis, Steven

Schultz, Henry

Yarberry, LeAnn

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Hamilton, Scott

Rodman, Kelly

Rodman, Kelly Elaine

Hamilton, Scott Phillip

Lawyer, Karen L.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

Rodman, Kelly Elaine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cook, Neil

Cook, Neil A.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Arruti, Mark

Sinclair, Spencer Douglas

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Kelly Elaine Rodman. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear OSC as to Mark Arruti, counsel for Cross Complainant., set for 01/11/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

Notice to Filing Party

12/18/2017: Notice to Filing Party

POS030 Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

Proof of service filed by Braga, David. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Payment Receipt

08/08/2015: Payment Receipt

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kelly Elaine Rodman served on 12/01/2015. Type of Service Personal. $85.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

notice of unavailability

12/15/2016: notice of unavailability

Summons to Cross Complaint

Summons to Cross-Complaint issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Default Prove-up Hearing held on 04/03/2018 09:00 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Braga, David; Yarberry, Leann. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Court entered in favor of PLTFS David Braga and LeAnn Yarberry and against DEFT Scott Phillip Hamilton filed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Case status updated to Judgment Pending. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Judgment by Court recorded. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Judgment , set for 04/20/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Hearing re: Default Prove-up Hearing held on April 3, 2018. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Default Prove-up Hearing held on 04/03/2018 09:00 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2015
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2015
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2015
  • Payment received for 194 - Complaint or other 1st paper in the amount of 435.00 on 08/08/2015, transaction number 1539363 and receipt number 408278. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2015
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2015
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 01/06/2016 at 08:45:00 AM in 41 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Holly, Carter. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2015
  • Original Summons filed by Braga, David; Yarberry, LeAnn; Reavis, Kimberly; Schultz, Henry; Reavis, Steven on 08/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Braga, David; Yarberry, LeAnn; Reavis, Kimberly; Schultz, Henry; Reavis, Steven on 08/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2015
  • Complaint filed by Braga, David; Yarberry, LeAnn; Reavis, Kimberly; Schultz, Henry; Reavis, Steven on 08/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion original filing filed by Yarberry, Leann; Braga, David. Action Type: Conversion original filing; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Arruti

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sinclair, Spencer Douglas