This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 03:16:38 (UTC).

Danny Baugh vs General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Danny Baugh filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0841

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baugh, Danny

Defendant

General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zolonz, Adam M.

Defendant Attorney

Davis, Stacey S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Baugh, Danny. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Baugh, Danny. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 12/03/2021 by Personal Service. $142.05. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

General Motors LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint --- First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Danny Baugh (Plaintiff); Participant: General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Stacey S. Davis, retained for General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Motors LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint --- First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received by LLC, General Motors in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 707926. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 12/03/2021 by Personal Service. $142.05. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/31/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Baugh, Danny. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Adam M. Zolonz, retained for Danny Baugh . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Baugh, Danny. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Danny Baugh in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 698512. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS STACEY S