This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 02:21:38 (UTC).

Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated vs J.R. Simplot Company

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against J R Simplot Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1105

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated

Defendant

J.R. Simplot Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ly, Liane Katzenstein

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated.

Notice of Serving Court's Notice of Case Assignment and Notice of Hearing

Notice of Serving Court's Notice of Case Assignment and Notice of Hearing filed by Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by J.R. Simplot Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated (Plaintiff); J.R. Simplot Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Removed to Federal Court.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by J.R. Simplot Company.; Action Type: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Serving Court's Notice of Case Assignment and Notice of Hearing filed by Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated.; Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/11/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketComplex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated.; Action Type: Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated.; Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received by an Danielle Marcy in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 716627.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received by an Danielle Marcy in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 716627.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Liane Katzenstein Ly, retained for Danielle Marcy, an individual, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LY LIANE KATZENSTEIN