This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 06:56:26 (UTC).

Dameron Hospital Association et al. vs Victoria M Rodriguez et al.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Dameron Hospital Association filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Victoria M Rodriguez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************8090

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dameron Hospital Association

Defendants

Rodriguez, Victoria M

Rodriguez, Joseph A

Assignee

Golden State Collections LLC

 

Court Documents

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Golden State Collections LLC. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Assignment of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment filed by Golden State Collections LLC. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/01/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Victoria M Rodriguez served on 11/13/2020 by Substituted Service. $75.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Joseph A Rodriguez served on 11/11/2020 by Personal Service. $75.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Dameron Hospital Association. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued as to Joseph A Rodriguez on 06/18/2021 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued as to Victoria M Rodriguez on 06/18/2021 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Golden State Collections LLC in the amount of $40.00. Receipt number 654492. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment filed by Golden State Collections LLC. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Golden State Collections LLC. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 6D; Result: Held; Judge: Richard M. Mallett; Participant: Dameron Hospital Association (Plaintiff); Participant: Joseph A Rodriguez (Defendant); Participant: Victoria M Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on March 1, 2021. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/01/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 6D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Richard M. Mallett; Participant: Dameron Hospital Association (Plaintiff); Participant: Joseph A Rodriguez (Defendant); Participant: Victoria M Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Victoria M Rodriguez served on 11/13/2020 by Substituted Service. $75.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Joseph A Rodriguez served on 11/11/2020 by Personal Service. $75.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal 1626.07 Adj Cost 50.00, set for 03/01/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal 1626.07 Adj Cost 50.00, set for 11/16/2020 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Dameron Hospital Association. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Dameron Hospital Association in the amount of $100.00. Receipt number 588538. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden State Collections, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dameron Hospital Association is a litigant