This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:41:43 (UTC).

Dameron Hospital Association A Corporation vs Tonya V Wilmont

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Dameron Hospital Association A Corporation filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Tonya. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1850

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dameron Hospital Association A Corporation

Defendant

Wilmont, Tonya V

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 04/18/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer filed by Dameron Hospital Association A Corporation. Action Type: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/28/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Dameron Hospital Association A Corporation. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/18/2016 12:00 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

05/24/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service as to Tonya V Wilmont (Personal). Costs 75.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer filed by Dameron Hospital Association A Corporation. Action Type: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on April 18, 2016. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/18/2016 12:00 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 04/18/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/28/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Tonya V Wilmont (Personal). Costs 75.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/28/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Principal 2500.00, adj costs 50.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $100.00. Receipt number 34078. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Dameron Hospital Association A Corporation. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less