This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 18:06:29 (UTC).

Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation vs. Fermin Alustiza

Case Summary

On 04/27/2011 Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Fermin Alustiza. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************6481

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation

Defendant

Alustiza, Fermin

Assignee

Golden State Collections Llc

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

04/27/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

SC109 Authorization to Appear

04/27/2011: SC109 Authorization to Appear

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

05/02/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Payment Receipt

05/02/2011: Payment Receipt

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

05/25/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Minute Order

06/15/2011: Minute Order

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

06/15/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

06/20/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Assignment of Judgment

08/03/2011: Assignment of Judgment

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/05/2011: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Payment Receipt

10/13/2011: Payment Receipt

EJ130 Writ of Execution

02/19/2015: EJ130 Writ of Execution

SC290 Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (Small Claims)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Golden State Collections Llc; Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Golden State Collections Llc; Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • DocketWrit has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned filed by Golden State Collections LLC on 02/24/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketCase note created on 11/04/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court associated on 10/13/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 10/13/2011, transaction number 877439 and receipt number 234251. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • DocketWrit issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • DocketCosts acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 2161.17. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 04/27/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 06 - Claims greater than 12 within previous 12 months in the amount of 100.00 on 05/02/2011, transaction number 785628 and receipt number 210395. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketAddress for Fermin Alustiza selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketAddress for Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial - Business (SC) - Plfts claim 2037.39 cost 50.00Auth to appear filed by Evy Morlino scheduled for 06/15/2011 at 03:00:00 PM in L2 at Lodi. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation on 04/27/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation on 04/27/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden State Collections, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dameron Hospital Association is a litigant