This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 02:45:11 (UTC).

Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation vs. Esteban E Hernandez

Case Summary

On 10/21/2010 Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Esteban E Hernandez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************8065

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation

Defendants

Hernandez, Maria C

Hernandez, Esteban E

Assignee

Golden State Collections Llc

 

Court Documents

EJ130 Writ of Execution

02/17/2012: EJ130 Writ of Execution

EJ130 Writ of Execution

04/27/2011: EJ130 Writ of Execution

Payment Receipt

04/27/2011: Payment Receipt

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

04/22/2011: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Assignment Of Judgmnent

03/24/2011: Assignment Of Judgmnent

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

01/27/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

01/19/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

01/19/2011: Minute Order

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

11/18/2010: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

11/18/2010: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

10/27/2010: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Payment Receipt

10/27/2010: Payment Receipt

SC109 Authorization to Appear

10/21/2010: SC109 Authorization to Appear

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/21/2010: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2012
  • Order to produce statement of assets and appear for examination has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Writ of Execution Returned filed by Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation on 02/17/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 04/27/2011, transaction number 783718 and receipt number 209843. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Writ issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 751.32. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Postjudgment interest accrued 7.40. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation on 04/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • Address for Golden State Collections LLC selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • Assignment of Judgment filed by Golden State Collections LLC on 03/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2010
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 10/21/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Payment received for 06 - Claims greater than 12 within previous 12 months in the amount of 100.00 on 10/27/2010, transaction number 631623 and receipt number 157473. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Address for Maria Hernandez selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Address for Esteban Hernandez selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Address for Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Court Trial - Business (SC) - Pltfs claim 613.92 cost 30.00Auth to appear filed by Evy Morlino scheduled for 01/19/2011 at 03:00:00 PM in L2 at Lodi. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation on 10/21/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Dameron Hospital Association, A Corporation on 10/21/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden State Collections, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dameron Hospital Association is a litigant