This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/06/2023 at 09:00:35 (UTC).

Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association vs Geico Casualty Company, a Nebraska Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Geico Casualty Company, a Nebraska Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0800

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association

Defendant

Geico Casualty Company, a Nebraska Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McMahon, John Anthony

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM015 Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association (Plaintiff); Geico Casualty Company, a Nebraska Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association (Plaintiff); Geico Casualty Company, a Nebraska Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference ORDERED RELATED- TO BE HEARD WITH OTHER DAMERON MATTERS. ES, set for 07/20/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/31/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPayment received by a Dameron Hospital Association in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 808046.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAttorney, John Anthony McMahon, retained for Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less