Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 03:13:26 (UTC).

Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association vs Alliance United Insurance Company, a California corporation

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alliance United Insurance Company, a California corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2243

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association

Defendant

Alliance United Insurance Company, a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McMahon, John Anthony

 

Court Documents

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EGC)

04/29/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EGC)

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Alliance United Insurance Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Participant: Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketErin Guy Castillo Assigned. BATCH Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/15/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received by a Dameron Hospital Association in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 629475. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney, John Anthony McMahon, retained for Dameron Hospital Association, a California Non-Profit Association . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Dameron Hospital Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMahon, John Anthony