This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:27:23 (UTC).

Daljeet Kaur Ratol vs Harminder Singh Samana

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Daljeet Kaur Ratol filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Harminder Singh Samana. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0839

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ratol, Daljeet Kaur

Respondent

Samana, Harminder Singh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Request for Default against Harminder Singh Samana Entered Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Ratol, Daljeet Kaur. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Ratol, Daljeet Kaur. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Ratol, Daljeet Kaur. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Samana, Harminder Singh. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Daljeet Kaur Ratol, Harminder Singh Samana Entered. Hearing 03/30/2016 @ 8:15am in F2 Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 03/30/2016 08:15 AM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on March 30, 2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial-Child Custody , set for 03/30/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO child custody, visitation, child support, set for 03/30/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • RFO-Request for Order filed by Ratol, Daljeet Kaur. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 33710. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Ratol, Daljeet Kaur. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 33710. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Ratol, Daljeet Kaur. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Ratol, Daljeet Kaur. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less