This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/26/2020 at 13:45:13 (UTC).

Daivd Gonzales et al. vs The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., A California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2016 Daivd Gonzales filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against The Permanente Medical Group, Inc , A California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L., Scott, W. Stephen and Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2284

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Scott, W. Stephen

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gonzales, Daivd

Erickson, Darrell

Hall, Jeannette

Worthington, Odete

Defendants

The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., A California Corporation

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California corporation

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarnoff, Raven Marie Ward

Defendant Attorney

Hawkins, Matthew K

 

Court Documents

Order

Order filed by Daivd Gonzales, Jeannette Hall, Darrell Erickson, Odete Worthington. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/07/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Plaintiff's Notice

Notice of Defendant's Motion to Change Venue filed by Worthington, Odete; Hall, Jeannette; Erickson, Darrell. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/07/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Receiving Transferred Action

Notice of Receiving Transferred Action. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Transmittal

Notice of Transmittal. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Archive Documents- Lead Case

Notice of Transmittal. LEAD Case Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Certified Copy of Order Changing Venue

Certified Copy of Order on Stipulation for an Order to Transfer Venue to San Joaquin Superior Court Stockton Branch filed. Action Type: Certified Copy of Order; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Receipt of Transferred Action

Receipt for Transfer of Records. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketW. Stephen Scott Assigned. BATCH Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed by Daivd Gonzales, Jeannette Hall, Darrell Erickson, Odete Worthington. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on September 7, 2016. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/07/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/19/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Defendant's Motion to Change Venue filed by Worthington, Odete; Hall, Jeannette; Erickson, Darrell. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/07/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Receiving Transferred Action. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Order on Stipulation for an Order to Transfer Venue to San Joaquin Superior Court Stockton Branch filed. Action Type: Certified Copy of Order; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 37842. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Matthew K Hawkins, retained for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., A California Corporation . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Worthington, Odete; Erickson, Darrell; Gonzales, Daivd; Hall, Jeannette. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Raven Marie Ward Sarnoff, retained for Odete Worthington . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Raven Marie Ward Sarnoff, retained for Daivd Gonzales . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Worthington, Odete; Erickson, Darrell; Gonzales, Daivd; Hall, Jeannette. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Raven Marie Ward Sarnoff, retained for Jeannette Hall . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less