This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/09/2020 at 03:15:16 (UTC).

Crystal Meza vs Topete Trucking et al.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Crystal Meza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Topete Trucking. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2415

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meza, Crystal

Defendants

Topete Trucking

Topete Bros Trucking, a California corporation

Vasquez, Filemon Santos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCann, Shawn J

Defendant Attorneys

Moore, Penny S

Ta, Jeffrey Vi

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Meza, Crystal. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Meza, Crystal. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS020 Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Topete Trucking served on 10/16/2019 by Personal Service. $126.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Filemon Santos Vasquez served on 11/01/2019 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Topete Bros Trucking, a California corporation served on 11/14/2019 by Substituted Service. $573.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Stipulation of the parties for change of venue to the Superior Court of Fresno County; and Order signed by Judge Abdallah

Stipulation of the parties for change of venue to the Superior Court of Fresno County; and Order signed by Judge Abdallah entered and filed. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice to Filing Party

01/22/2020: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Transmittal

Notice of Transmittal. Action Type: Change of Venue-Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Receipt For Records

Clerk's Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records. Action Type: Change of Venue-Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records. Action Type: Change of Venue-Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Transferred. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Penny S Moore, retained for Topete Bros Trucking, a California corporation . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Jeffrey Vi Ta, retained for Filemon Santos Vasquez . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Transmittal. Action Type: Change of Venue-Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Crystal Meza in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 528054. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation of the parties for change of venue to the Superior Court of Fresno County; and Order signed by Judge Abdallah entered and filed. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Paper Fee for Stipulation filed by Vasquez, Filemon Santos. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Paper Fee for Stipulation filed by Topete Bros Trucking, a California corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Crystal Meza in the amount of $870.00. Receipt number 519251. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Topete Trucking served on 10/16/2019 by Personal Service. $126.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/17/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Shawn J McCann, retained for Crystal Meza . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Meza, Crystal. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Meza, Crystal. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Crystal Meza in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 475384. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Crystal Meza in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 475384. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCANN, SHAWN J.