This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:44:55 (UTC).

Crystal Christensen et al. vs Clifford Lindsay et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Crystal Christensen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Clifford Lindsay. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1882

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christensen, Crystal

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Lindsay, Clifford

Cross Defendant

Morrison, Kassandra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Waters, Robert T.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Berry, Mark Emmett

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Christensen, Crystal. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Related Case(s)

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Christensen, Crystal. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Lindsay, Clifford. Also Scan in Consolidated Case -2015-9939 Action Type: Answer; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Lindsay, Clifford. Also Scan in Consolidated Case -2015-9939 Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2017
  • Attorney, Mark Emmett Berry, retained for Clifford Lindsay . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Case associated with case: , STK-CV-UAT-2015-0009939 Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Lindsay, Clifford. Also Scan in Consolidated Case -2015-9939 Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Lindsay, Clifford. Also Scan in Consolidated Case -2015-9939 Action Type: Answer; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/19/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Christensen, Crystal. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34305. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Christensen, Crystal. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Robert T. Waters, retained for Crystal Christensen . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice of Related Case filed by Christensen, Crystal. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less