This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 16:44:53 (UTC).

Cruz Makiano vs PAQ, Inc. DBA as Rancho San Miguel Market

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Cruz Makiano filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAQ, Inc DBA as Rancho San Miguel Market. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alva, Jose L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************8937

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Alva, Jose L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Makiano, Cruz

Defendant

PAQ, Inc. DBA as Rancho San Miguel Market

 

Court Documents

SC-100

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Makiano, Cruz.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to PAQ, Inc. DBA as Rancho San Miguel Market served on 10/08/2021 by Personal Service. $95.00.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 11/08/2021 10:30 AM .

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: L2; Result: Held; Judge: Carter Holly; Participants; Cruz Makiano (Plaintiff); PAQ, Inc. DBA as Rancho San Miguel Market (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on November 8, 2021.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 11/08/2021 10:30 AM .; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Judgment entered and filed.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to PAQ, Inc. DBA as Rancho San Miguel Market served on 10/08/2021 by Personal Service. $95.00.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $10,000.00; Cost $75.00, set for 11/08/2021 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department L2.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Makiano, Cruz.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Cruz Makiano in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 681804.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paq, Inc. dba Food 4 Less and/or Rancho San Miguel Markets, a California Corporation is a litigant