This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 18:28:39 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank vs Jenaro Soto Vega

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jenaro Soto Vega. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0843

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank

Defendant

Soto Vega, Jenaro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas, Vanessa

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank.

Complaint

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jenaro Soto Vega served on 12/10/2022 by Personal Service. $86.50.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Jenaro Soto Vega served on 12/10/2022 by Personal Service. $86.50.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received by LLC Crown Asset Management in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 790716.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Vanessa Thomas, retained for Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of First Electronic Bank .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS VANESSA