This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/08/2022 at 03:55:37 (UTC).

Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation vs Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc , A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alva, Jose L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2192

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Alva, Jose L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation

Defendant

Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Bryant, Eurik

Defendant Attorneys

Griffith, Amanda N

Kubein, Ramsey

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 04/30/2021 09:47 AM . Judge: Warner, David P..

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 04/30/2021 09:47 AM . Judge: Warner, David P..

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

UD101 Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations - Unlawful Detainer

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Notice to Filing Party

07/07/2021: Notice to Filing Party

Answer

Defendant Bethel Open Bible Church's Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Opposition

Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Court Room: L2; Result: Held; Judge: Carter Holly; Participant: Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Motion to Compel held on February 4, 2022. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion to Compel held on 02/04/2022 10:30 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Request for Telephonic Appearance - Granted as to Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSJCV1 Request for Telephonic Appearance filed by Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: SJCV1 Request for Telephonic Appearance; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Responses to Form Interrogatories-Set One, Special Interrogatories- Set One, Request for Admissions- Set One, Request for Production of Documents - Set One, And for Award of Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $2,040.00 filed by Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition filed by Bethel Open Bible Church, aka Bethel Tabernacle dba Bethel Church, A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion to Compel , set for 02/04/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department L2. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Inc., Cross Culture Christian Center in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 710444. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received by aka Bethel Open Bible Church in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 631674. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Forcible Entry, Constructive Eviction, and Specific Performance of Commercial Lease - Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Inc., Cross Culture Christian Center in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 629141. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Eurik O'Bryant, retained for Cross Culture Christian Center, Inc., A California Religious Nonprofit Corporation . Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Griffith, Amanda N

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramsey Kubein