This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 03:55:40 (UTC).

County of San Joaquin et al. vs City of Manteca et al.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 County of San Joaquin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against City of Manteca. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger and Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1129

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of San Joaquin

Defendants

City of Manteca

Vandewater, Glenn

Intervenor

Mendez, Raul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Weyuker, Richard A.

Defendant Attorney

Schirmer, Keith Richard

Intervenor Attorney

Tavakoli, Neema

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to City of Manteca served on 03/15/2021 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Glenn Vandewater served on 03/15/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Answer

Answer to complaint for Subrogation recovery First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Vandewater, Glenn; City of Manteca. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

05/15/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Motion for Leave to Intervene (C.C.P. 387 and Labor Code 3852-3853) filed by Mendez, Raul. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Motion

Motion for Leave to Intervene (C.C.P. 387 and Labor Code 3852-3853) filed by Mendez, Raul. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice

Notice of Motion for Leave to Intervene (C.C.P. 387 and Labor Code 3852-3853) filed by Mendez, Raul. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: City of Manteca (Defendant); Participant: County of San Joaquin (Plaintiff); Participant: Glenn Vandewater (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion for Leave; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: City of Manteca (Defendant); Participant: County of San Joaquin (Plaintiff); Participant: Glenn Vandewater (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received by City of Manteca in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 656868. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion for Leave to Intervene (C.C.P. 387 and Labor Code 3852-3853) filed by Mendez, Raul. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion for Leave , set for 07/29/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Neema Tavakoli, retained for Raul Mendez . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion for Leave to Intervene (C.C.P. 387 and Labor Code 3852-3853) filed by Mendez, Raul. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Intervene (C.C.P. 387 and Labor Code 3852-3853) filed by Mendez, Raul. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Raul Mendez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 655408. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to complaint for Subrogation recovery First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Vandewater, Glenn; City of Manteca. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Glenn Vandewater served on 03/15/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to City of Manteca served on 03/15/2021 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/06/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Richard A. Weyuker, retained for County of San Joaquin . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAVAKOLI NEEMA ESQ.