This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 11:00:30 (UTC).

County of San Joaquin Revenue and Recovery vs. Amanda L Hendricks

Case Summary

On 02/17/2011 County of San Joaquin Revenue and Recovery filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Amanda L Hendricks. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2510

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County Of San Joaquin Revenue And Recovery

Defendant

Hendricks, Amanda L

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

02/17/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

02/18/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Envelope - Certified Mail Returned

02/28/2011: Envelope - Certified Mail Returned

Minute Order

04/08/2011: Minute Order

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

04/13/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

05/06/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Minute Order

06/03/2011: Minute Order

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

06/03/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

06/08/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

EJ001 Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

08/08/2011: EJ001 Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

08/19/2011: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketCosts acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 2442.50. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketPostjudgment costs acknowledged 25.00. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by County of San Joaquin Revenue and Recovery on 08/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DocketAbstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketCase status updated to Post Judgment effective 07/08/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 95 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 75 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 02/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketAddress for Amanda Hendricks selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketAddress for County of San Joaquin Revenue and Recovery selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial - Business (SC) - Principal, 2263.00Costs, 110.00 scheduled for 04/08/2011 at 10:30:00 AM in T2 at Tracy. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by County of San Joaquin Revenue and Recovery on 02/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCertified Mail Receipt filed by County of San Joaquin Revenue and Recovery on 02/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by County of San Joaquin Revenue and Recovery on 02/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less