This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 07:09:35 (UTC).

County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California et al. vs Stockton Park Village, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against Stockton Park Village, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6403

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California

Defendants

Fairbanks, Anne

Fairbanks, Howard

Stockton Park Village, LLC

Receiver

Adams, Mark S.

Interested Party

Riley, Bobby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Merrill, Zayante (Zoey) P

Receiver Attorney

Adams, Mark S

Interested Party Attorney

Sousa, Monica

 

Court Documents

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Status Hearing, Motion for Order held on 11/15/2021 10:00 AM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Declaration

Declaration of Mark Adams Re: Lender Letter filed by Adams, Mark S.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Objection

Interested Party Bobby Riley's Objections to Receiver's September 2021 Monthly Accounting of Receivership Income, Expenses, Ad Interim Fees filed by Riley, Bobby. Action Type: Objection; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Receiver's Report

Third Report of Receiver filed by Adams, Mark S.. Action Type: Receiver's Report; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Order Authorizing Certificate

Order Authorizing Certificate filed by Mark S. Adams. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion for Order, Status Hearing held on 11/02/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Declaration

September 2021 Monthly Accounting of Receivership Income, Expenses, and Interim Fees; (Proposed) Order filed by Adams, Mark S.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Amended Proof of Service

Second Amended Proof of Service as to WTGC, LLC Only of Interested Party Bobby Riley's Opposition to Receiver's Motion to Vacate the Park & Objection to the Receivers Supplemental Inventory; Declaration of Ronald Barber Jr.in Support Thereof filed by Riley, Bobby. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion for Order; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Anne Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Bobby Riley (Interested Party); Participant: County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California (Plaintiff); Participant: Howard Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Mark S. Adams (Receiver); Participant: Stockton Park Village, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Anne Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California (Plaintiff); Participant: Howard Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Stockton Park Village, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion for Order; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Anne Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Bobby Riley (Interested Party); Participant: County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California (Plaintiff); Participant: Howard Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Mark S. Adams (Receiver); Participant: Stockton Park Village, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketOrder filed by Mark S. Adams. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion for Order , set for 12/01/2021 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion for Order; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Anne Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Bobby Riley (Interested Party); Participant: County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California (Plaintiff); Participant: Howard Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Mark S. Adams (Receiver); Participant: Stockton Park Village, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Status Hearing; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Anne Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Bobby Riley (Interested Party); Participant: County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California (Plaintiff); Participant: Howard Fairbanks (Defendant); Participant: Mark S. Adams (Receiver); Participant: Stockton Park Village, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion for Order Receiver's Motion for Order to Vacated Property, set for 12/01/2022 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Hearing, Motion for Order held on 11/15/2021 10:00 AM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Ex Parte PLTF's PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION FOR MAINTAINING A PUBLIC NUISANCE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PENALTIES FOR MAINTAINING A PUBLIC NUISANCE., set for 07/27/2021 at 9:15 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/18/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Steven Butler in Support of the Complaint for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Relif and Penalties for Maintaining an Public Nuisance filed by County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Kyle Krause in Support Complaint for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Relief and Penalties for Maintaining a Public Nuisance filed by County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Michael Suszycki in Support of the Complaint for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Relief and Penalties for Maintaining a Public Nuisance filed by County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Zayante (Zoey) P Merrill, retained for County of San Joaquin, a political subdivision of the State of California . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less