This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 08:10:02 (UTC).

Coulson & Associates, Ltd vs Marissa S Hill

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Coulson Associates, Ltd filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Marissa S Hill. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2175

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coulson & Associates, Ltd

Defendant

Hill, Marissa S

 

Court Documents

RESET SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2525.01 and Costs 50.00, set for 09/28/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Coulson & Associates, Ltd. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET sc100 RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2525.01 and Costs $50.00, set for 10/03/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2525.01 and Costs $ 50.00, set for 06/13/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2525.01 and Costs $50.00, set for 10/03/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Hearing Result: Reset - Parties Motion Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2525.01 and Costs 50.00, set for 09/28/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Hearing Result: Reset - Parties Motion Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped as to 4/11/2016 court trial. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2525.01 and Costs $ 50.00, set for 06/13/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 04/11/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Unassigned in Department 17. principal 2525.01 adj 50.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 36722. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Coulson & Associates, Ltd. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less