This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:53:11 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC,RRD vs Maylinda Hiedeman

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC,RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Maylinda Hiedeman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1983

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC,RRD

Defendant

Hiedeman, Maylinda

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service as to Maylinda Hiedeman (Certified Mail). Signed by named defendant. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Hiedeman, Maylinda. Action Type: Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2016
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Hiedeman, Maylinda. Action Type: Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on April 4, 2016. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Maylinda Hiedeman (Certified Mail). Signed by named defendant. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Principal 4143.50, adj Costs 65.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less