This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:51:56 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC,RRD vs Maria D Garciapadilla et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC,RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Maria D Garciapadilla. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1968

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC,RRD

Defendants

Munoz, Julio

Garciapadilla, Maria D

 

Court Documents

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

request for dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to COSJ-TTC,RRD, Maria D Garciapadilla, Julio Munoz Entered. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Julio Munoz served on 09/15/2016 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (certified mail) returned Unclaimed as to Julio Munoz. Costs 15.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET sc100 RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2117.29 and Adj Costs $80.00, set for 11/28/2016 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Maria D Garciapadilla. Costs Certified mail returned UNCLAIMED ----not served Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Maria D Garciapadilla served on 09/15/2016 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated dismissal filed on 10/24/2016 Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Request for Dismissal as to entire action with prejudice, l filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to COSJ-TTC,RRD, Maria D Garciapadilla, Julio Munoz Entered. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (SC) as to Maria D Garciapadilla served on 09/15/2016 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (SC) as to Julio Munoz served on 09/15/2016 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2117.29 and Adj Costs $80.00, set for 11/28/2016 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (certified mail) returned Unclaimed as to Julio Munoz. Costs 15.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Maria D Garciapadilla. Costs Certified mail returned UNCLAIMED ----not served Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department J2. Principal 2117.29, adj Costs 80.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less