This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:53:06 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC,RRD vs James E Harris III

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC,RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against James E Harris III. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1982

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC,RRD

Defendant

Harris, James E III

 

Court Documents

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/27/2017 03:56 PM . Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

Notice to Filing Party

06/08/2017: Notice to Filing Party

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service as to James E Harris III (Certified Mail). Unable to Determine Signature Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 818.00 and Costs 45.00, set for 01/03/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to James E Harris III served on 02/01/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. 110.00 Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/27/2017 03:56 PM . Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 27, 2017. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to James E Harris III served on 02/01/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 818.00 and Costs 45.00, Reset for 03/27/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Orcutt, Charlotte.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Hearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Orcutt, Charlotte.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Due Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. 110.00 Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 818.00 and Costs 45.00, set for 01/03/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to James E Harris III (Certified Mail). Unable to Determine Signature Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Prinjcipal 818.00, adj Costs 45.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less