This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:52:56 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC,RRD vs Gilbert Guzman

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC,RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gilbert Guzman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1980

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC,RRD

Defendant

Guzman, Gilbert

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Gilbert Guzman. Costs Certified Mail RETRUNED UNCLAIMED ... NOT servede Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. as to Gilbert Guzman. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 01/03/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2017
  • Request for Dismissal - Filing as to COSJ-TTC,RRD, Gilbert Guzman Entered. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. as to Gilbert Guzman. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Orcutt, Charlotte.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Hearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Orcutt, Charlotte.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Due Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 01/03/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Gilbert Guzman. Costs Certified Mail RETRUNED UNCLAIMED ... NOT servede Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Principal 1172.00, adj Costs 45.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC,RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less