This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:56:20 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC, RRD vs Marvin S Avila

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC, RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Marvin S Avila. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2018

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC, RRD

Defendant

Avila, Marvin S

 

Court Documents

Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD, Marvin S Avila. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

07/21/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service as to Marvin S Avila (Certified Mail). Signed by named defendant. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

SC108 Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/04/2016 04:25 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued as to Marvin S. Avila AKA Marvin Avila Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD, Marvin S Avila. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/04/2016 04:25 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on April 4, 2016. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Marvin S Avila (Certified Mail). Signed by named defendant. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 2379.91 and Adj Cost 65.00, set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less