This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:59:40 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC, RRD vs John Sparks

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC, RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against John Sparks. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2057

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC, RRD

Defendant

Sparks, John

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Affidavit; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 3535.96 Adj. Costs $190.00, RESET for 10/30/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to John Sparks. Costs Certified Mail RETURNED UNCLAIMED ,,, not served Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 3535.96 Adj. Costs $130.00, RESET for 08/07/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Request for certified mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligencefiled by COSJ-TTC, RRD. 60.00 Action Type: Affidavit; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 3535.96 and Adj. Costs $65.00, set for 05/08/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 23. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

affidavit of reasonable diligence

Proof of Service (SC) returned Unserved as to John Sparks. Costs $65.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to COSJ-TTC, RRD, John Sparks Granted. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Affidavit; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 3535.96 Adj. Costs $190.00, RESET for 10/30/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Reasonable Diligencefiled by COSJ-TTC, RRD. 60.00 Action Type: Affidavit; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 3535.96 Adj. Costs $130.00, RESET for 08/07/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (SC) returned Unserved as to John Sparks. Costs $65.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 3535.96 and Adj. Costs $65.00, set for 05/08/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 23. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to John Sparks. Costs Certified Mail RETURNED UNCLAIMED ,,, not served Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 3535.96 and Adj. Costs $65.00, set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less