This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:58:46 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC, RRD vs Jesus Espindola

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC, RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jesus Espindola. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2046

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC, RRD

Defendant

Espindola, Jesus

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service as to Jesus Espindola (Certified Mail). Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Request for certified mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/05/2016 07:46 AM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2016
  • Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/05/2016 07:46 AM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on April 4, 2016. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Jesus Espindola (Certified Mail). Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $4043.30 and Adj Costs $45.00, set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less