This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:59:06 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC, RRD vs Iris Garcia et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC, RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Iris Garcia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2050

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC, RRD

Defendants

Garcia, Angel

Garcia, Iris

 

Court Documents

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $105.77 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/27/2017 03:53 PM . Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Angel Garcia served on 02/01/2017 by Substituted Service. $45.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Iris Garcia served on 02/01/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Angel Garcia served on 02/01/2017 by Personal Service. $45.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. as to Iris Garcia. Cost 110.00 Action Type: Affidavit; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. as to Angel Garcia. Costs 60.00 Action Type: Affidavit; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 716.50 and Adj Costs 60.00, set for 01/03/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Angel Garcia. Costs Returned unclaimed Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

proof of service

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Iris Garcia. Costs Certified mail returned UNCLAIMED----NOT SERVED Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Request for certified mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $105.77 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Angel Garcia on 03/27/2018 to Sacramento County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Iris Garcia on 03/27/2018 to Sacramento County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/27/2017 03:53 PM . Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 27, 2017. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (SC) as to Angel Garcia served on 02/01/2017 by Substituted Service. $45.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. as to Angel Garcia. Costs 60.00 Action Type: Affidavit; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 716.50 and Adj Costs 60.00, set for 01/03/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Angel Garcia. Costs Returned unclaimed Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Iris Garcia. Costs Certified mail returned UNCLAIMED----NOT SERVED Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 716.50 and Adj Costs 60.00, set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less