This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:59:25 (UTC).

COSJ-TTC, RRD vs Arthur M Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 COSJ-TTC, RRD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Arthur M Rodriguez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2054

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSJ-TTC, RRD

Defendants

Rodriguez, Arthur M

Arthur M. Rodriguez AKA Arthur Rodriguez,

 

Court Documents

Reset SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Hearing regarding: Court Trial , Reset for 05/01/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Arthur M. Rodriguez AKA Arthur Rodriguez served on 04/01/2017 by Substituted Service. $110.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service RTN UNSERVED

Proof of Service certified mail returned Unserved as to Arthur M Rodriguez. Costs $15.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 02/21/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

request for certified mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 05/01/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $107.95 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SC) as to Arthur M Rodriguez served on 12/31/2016 by Substituted Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $107.95 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 05/01/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on May 1, 2017. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (SC) as to Arthur M. Rodriguez AKA Arthur Rodriguez served on 04/01/2017 by Substituted Service. $110.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , Reset for 05/01/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (SC) as to Arthur M Rodriguez served on 12/31/2016 by Substituted Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 02/21/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $4738.39 and Adj Cost. $ 65.00, set for 02/21/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service certified mail returned Unserved as to Arthur M Rodriguez. Costs $15.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $4738.39 and Adj Cost. $ 65.00, set for 04/04/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Certified Mail filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less