This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/09/2023 at 13:45:04 (UTC).

Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation vs Erin Brown

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc , a California corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Erin Brown. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0152

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation

Defendant

Brown, Erin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaye, Douglas M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration Re Venue filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Erin Brown served on 01/20/2023 by Substituted Service. $117.01.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Erin Brown Entered

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.

Declaration

Waiver of Interest filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.

Declaration

Declaration Re: Original Documents and / or Lost Instrument filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation against Erin Brown in the amount of 13285.14.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2023

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Erin Brown (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJudgment for Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation against Erin Brown in the amount of 13285.14.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWaiver of Interest filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Re: Original Documents and / or Lost Instrument filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Erin Brown Entered; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Erin Brown served on 01/20/2023 by Substituted Service. $117.01.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/10/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Re Venue filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Inc., Consumer Portfolio Services in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 802432.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Douglas M. Kaye, retained for Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California corporation .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less