This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/18/2018 at 07:45:36 (UTC).

Conservatorship of Chull Song

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Conservatorship of Chull Song was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holland, Lesley D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0180

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holland, Lesley D.

 

Party Details

Conservator

San Joaquin Public Conservator

Conservatee

Song, Chull

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

Ribeiro, Lisa S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • Hearing re: Account and Report held on July 27, 2017. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Account and Report held on 07/27/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Order Approving First and Final Account and Report filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Hearing re: Account and Report held on June 29, 2017. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Account and Report held on 06/29/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Notice of Hearing - Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Notice of Hearing - Guardianship or Conservatorship GC-020; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Account and Report , set for 06/29/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Account and Report - Conservatorship filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Account and Report - Conservatorship; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Inventory & Appraisal held on 07/26/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • Citation filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Citation; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Declaration filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice of Hearing filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Appointment of Conservator , set for 04/26/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Capacity Declaration filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship GC-355; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator Person and Estate or Estate Only filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator Person and Estate or Estate Only GC-310; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator Person and Estate or Estate Only GC-310; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by San Joaquin Public Conservator. Action Type: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator Person and Estate or Estate Only GC-310; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Lisa S Ribeiro, County Counsel of San Joaquin County retained for San Joaquin Public Conservator . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less