This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 06:45:36 (UTC).

Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA vs Anthony Zemlock

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Collecto, Inc dba EOS-CCA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Anthony Zemlock. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4746

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

declaration

Declaration filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Anthony Zemlock served on 11/19/2020 by Substituted Service. $80.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 12/07/2020 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default and Default Clerk Judgment filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration of Interest in Support of Request for Entry of Clerk's Judgment filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Anthony Zemlock Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

Civ110-Request for Dismissal

02/08/2021: Civ110-Request for Dismissal

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA, Anthony Zemlock Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Carter Holly; Participant: Anthony Zemlock (Defendant); Participant: Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA, Anthony Zemlock Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Anthony Zemlock Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest in Support of Request for Entry of Clerk's Judgment filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Clerk Judgment filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Carter Holly; Participant: Anthony Zemlock (Defendant); Participant: Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/07/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Michael K. Sipes, retained for Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Collecto, Inc. dba EOS-CCA. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Collecto in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 564436. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less