This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/27/2018 at 09:22:43 (UTC).

Clayton Staples vs. Entra Default Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2013 Clayton Staples filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Entra Default Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9762

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Staples, Clayton

Staples, Patricia

Defendants

CAM III Trust, a trust

Corona Asset Management III, LLC a limited liability company

Entra Default Solutions, LLC, a limited liability company

Mortgagepointer.com, Inc., a corporation

Entra Default Solutions, Llc

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Gann Properties, Lp, A California Limited Partnership

Fv-1, Inc., A Business Entity, Form Unknown, As Trustee For Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings Llc

Citigroup Global Markets Realty Corporation, A New York Corporation

Sand Canyon Corporation, A California Corporation And Formerly Known As Option One Mortgage Corporation, A California Corporation

Bsi Financial Services

Miscellaneous Participant,

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/07/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

07/09/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

03/05/2014: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

03/05/2014: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

03/05/2014: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

02/28/2014: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

02/24/2014: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

01/22/2014: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

12/18/2013: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

12/16/2013: Tentative Rulings

Payment Receipt

11/06/2013: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

10/17/2013: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

09/25/2013: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

09/25/2013: Payment Receipt

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 12 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Status of BSI Financial Services updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Status of FV-1, Inc., a business entity, form unknown, as trustee for Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Status of Citigroup Global Markets Realty Corporation, a New York corporation updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Status of Sand Canyon Corporation, a California corporation and formerly known as Option One Mortgage Corporation, a California corporation updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Status of Entra Default Solutions, LLC, a limited liability company updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Status of Mortgagepointer.com, Inc., a corporation updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2013
  • Cause of Action number 3 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Cause of Action number 2 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Automatic Unlimited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 02/24/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Ross, Roger. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Original Summons filed by Staples, Clayton; Staples, Patricia on 09/25/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Staples, Clayton; Staples, Patricia on 09/25/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Complaint filed by Staples, Clayton; Staples, Patricia on 09/25/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citigroup Global Markets Reality Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTRA DEFAULT SOLUTIONS LLC A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SAND CANYON CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant