This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:40:36 (UTC).

Citizens Bank, N.A. vs Ross V Tanner et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Citizens Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ross. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kronlund, Barbara and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1839

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kronlund, Barbara

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citizens Bank, N.A.

Defendants

Tanner, Maxine L

Tanner, Ross V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mendelson, Lee M.

Defendant Attorney

Smith, Andrew D

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ross V Tanner served on 03/14/2016. Type of Service Personal. $79.50. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/19/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

Declaration

Declaration of Non Service filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/03/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice

Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration Re: Venue filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EH)

Elizabeth Humphreys Assigned. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration of Non Service filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Assignment, set for 08/14/2017 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference Re: Trial Status, set for 05/03/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Order Required) filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Citizens Bank, N.A., Ross V Tanner, Maxine L Tanner Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Hearing Result: Court trial Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on May 3, 2017. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/03/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference Re: Trial Status, set for 05/03/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Assignment, set for 08/14/2017 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Ross V Tanner served on 03/14/2016. Type of Service Personal. $79.50. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/19/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Re: Venue filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 33980. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Lee M. Mendelson, retained for Citizens Bank, N.A. . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less