This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 12:51:15 (UTC).

Citibank (South Dakota) NA vs. Oscar V Yanez

Case Summary

On 04/08/2010 Citibank South Dakota NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Oscar. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5783

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank (South Dakota) Na

Defendant

Yanez, Oscar V

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

04/09/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

04/09/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Judgement Public Civil

01/01/1900: Archival Judgement Public Civil

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Complaint Petition Civil Public

01/01/1900: Archival Complaint Petition Civil Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • DocketComplaint associated on 08/09/2011. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Citibank (South Dakota) NA on 08/05/2011. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketUpdate zipcode to 95336 effective 01/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil in the amount of 25.00 on 01/24/2011, transaction number 722750 and receipt number 190298. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketAbstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • DocketAssociation created between Hunt, Michael S and Citibank (South Dakota) NA. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • DocketComplaint associated on 12/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 04/08/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 137 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K in the amount of 205.00 on 04/09/2010, transaction number 511101 and receipt number 121441. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketAddress for Michael Hunt selected. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Citibank (South Dakota) NA on 04/08/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citibank (South Dakota) NA on 04/08/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Citibank (South Dakota) NA on 04/08/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant