This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:25:40 (UTC).

Cindy Lynn Lucas et al. vs Jose Abraham Lujan Lopez

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Cindy Lynn Lucas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jose Abraham Lujan Lopez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2016

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucas, Cindy Lynn

Defendant

Lujan Lopez, Jose Abraham

Not Yet Classified

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson, Gary C.

Defendant Attorney

Noble, Andrew F

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Anderson, John R

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jose Abraham Lujan Lopez served on 06/16/2016 by Personal Service. $182.50. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Lujan Lopez, Jose Abraham. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/25/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lucas, Cindy Lynn. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Lien

Notice of Lien Pursuant to Labor Code 3850-3864 filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lujan Lopez, Jose Abraham. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lujan Lopez, Jose Abraham. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 02/02/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lucas, Cindy Lynn. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lujan Lopez, Jose Abraham. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lucas, Cindy Lynn. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

First Amended Notice of Lien

First Amended Notice of Lien Pursuant to Labor Code 3850-3864 filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lucas, Cindy Lynn. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 05/03/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Cindy Lynn Lucas, Jose Abraham Lujan Lopez Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lucas, Cindy Lynn. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Cindy Lynn Lucas, Jose Abraham Lujan Lopez Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with prejduice filed by Lujan Lopez, Jose Abraham. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference Further Trial Setting, set for 08/28/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 10A. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 05/03/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on May 3, 2017. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Lujan Lopez, Jose Abraham. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Lucas, Cindy Lynn. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Jose Abraham Lujan Lopez served on 06/16/2016 by Personal Service. $182.50. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lien Pursuant to Labor Code 3850-3864 filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/25/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lucas, Cindy Lynn. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by Law Office of Gary C. Nelson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 35476. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lucas, Cindy Lynn. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Gary C. Nelson, retained for Cindy Lynn Lucas . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less