Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:17:18 (UTC).

Christopher Hinojosa et al. vs Rebecca Washington et al.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2016 Christopher Hinojosa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rebecca Washington. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2940

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lopes, Antoine

Hinojosa, Christopher

Defendants

Daimler Trust, LSR

Washington, Rebecca

Washington, Henry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Agbulos, Markus A

Defendant Attorney

McFadden, John Alan

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE - Entire Action as to Christopher Hinojosa, Antoine Lopes, Rebecca Washington, Henry Washington, Daimler Trust, LSR Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/20/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lopes, Antoine. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Washington, Rebecca. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Washington, Rebecca; Washington, Henry. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Christopher Hinojosa. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Answer

Answer To Complaint filed by Washington, Henry; Washington, Rebecca. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal -Exemplary Damages cause of Action Only file by Christopher Hinojosa Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Washington, Henry; Washington, Rebecca. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury filed by Hinojosa, Christopher; Lopes, Antoine. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hinojosa, Christopher; Lopes, Antoine. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE - Entire Action as to Christopher Hinojosa, Antoine Lopes, Rebecca Washington, Henry Washington, Daimler Trust, LSR Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Daimler Trust, LSR; Washington, Rebecca; Washington, Henry. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on June 20, 2017. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/20/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 09/19/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 10A. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Lopes, Antoine. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Washington, Rebecca. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Washington, Rebecca; Washington, Henry. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2017
  • Payment received by Henry Washington in the amount of $870.00. Receipt number 136394. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/20/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Attorney, Markus A Agbulos, retained for Christopher Hinojosa . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Attorney, Markus A Agbulos, retained for Antoine Lopes . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury filed by Hinojosa, Christopher; Lopes, Antoine. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Payment received by Christopher Hinojosa in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 128812. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hinojosa, Christopher; Lopes, Antoine. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAIMLER TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Agbulos, Markus A