This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 02:14:15 (UTC).

Christine A Tanson vs Elvis A Tanson

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Christine A Tanson filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Elvis A Tanson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1386

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Tanson, Christine A.

Tanson, Christine A

Respondents

Tanson, Elvis A.

Tanson, Elvis A

Not Classified By Court

Lopez - 2019, Bea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Thiessen, Lisa

Dorn, Jessica

Respondent Attorney

Norton, Michael R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Modification; Court Room: 4A; Judge: Robin Appel; Participants; Bea Lopez - 2019 (Mediator); Christine A Tanson (Petitioner); Elvis A Tanson (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $41.00, receipt number 751394.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Modification Petitioner's RFO MOD Child Custody, Visitation, OST, set for 07/08/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Contempt; Court Room: 4A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Robin Appel; Participants; Elvis A Tanson (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Modification; Court Room: 4A; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Robin Appel; Participants; Bea Lopez - 2019 (Mediator); Christine A Tanson (Petitioner); Elvis A Tanson (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Request for Order-Modification held on 06/01/2022 09:00 AM .; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Request for Order as to Elvis A Tanson served on 05/25/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketFindings and Orders After Hearing as to Christine A Tanson, Elvis A Tanson Entered.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time Denied and filed on 05/04/2021.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRFO Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time-Submitted submitted by Tanson, Christine A.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Lisa Thiessen in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 642614.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Elvis A. Tanson filed. Served on 04/27/2021. Method of Service: Substituted Service; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Lisa Thiessen in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 635888.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Lisa Thiessen, retained for Christine A. Tanson .; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by Tanson, Christine A..; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Tanson, Christine A..; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norton, Michael R