This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:43:28 (UTC).

Christina Yanez vs Wence Barraza Millan et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Christina Yanez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wence Barraza Millan. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1867

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yanez, Christina

Defendants

Barraza Millan, Wence

Diaz Reyes, Emiliano

Gomez, Heriberto

Estate of Wence Barraza Millan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ginsburg, William S.

Hadwen, Deborah A

Defendant Attorney

McFadden, John Alan

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gomez, Heriberto. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice to Filing Party

11/03/2017: Notice to Filing Party

CM020 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings and Orders filed by Christina Yanez. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 02/20/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM020 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings and Orders filed by Christina Yanez. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM020 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings and Orders filed by Christina Yanez. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Wence Barraza Millan served on 08/18/2017 by Substituted Service. $50.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/17/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Yanez, Christina. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yanez, Christina. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Emiliano Diaz Reyes served on 08/18/2017 by Substituted Service. $55.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Yanez, Christina. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/19/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer to Complaint

Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Estate of Wence Barraza Millan. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Order Required) filed by Christina Yanez. (doe 1 - Estate of Wence Barraza Millan) - signed by Judge Holly Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Heriberto Gomez served on 08/18/2017 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/18/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/19/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on June 19, 2018. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Payment received by Estate of Wence Barraza Millan in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 303760. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Estate of Wence Barraza Millan. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Attorney, John Alan McFadden, retained for Estate of Wence Barraza Millan . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 06/19/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 02/20/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on February 20, 2018. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 02/20/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings and Orders and Continuing CMC Hearing filed by Christina Yanez. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings and Orders filed by Christina Yanez. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/22/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Yanez, Christina. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by One Legal LLC in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34159. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Yanez, Christina. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, William S. Ginsburg, retained for Christina Yanez . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less