This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 11:52:33 (UTC).

Christie Lagera et al. vs Christina Micciche et al.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Christie Lagera filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Christina Micciche. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0222

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lagera, Christie

Rodgers, Samuel

Defendants

Equity Management, Inc.

Garcia, Justin

Micciche, Christina

Opportunity Investments, LP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Partiyeli, Jacob O

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lagera, Christie; Rodgers, Samuel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lagera, Christie; Rodgers, Samuel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

POS010 Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Equity Management, Inc. served on 11/08/2021 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Opportunity Investments, LP. served on 11/05/2021 by Personal Service. $27.50. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Christie Lagera (Plaintiff); Participant: Christina Micciche (Defendant); Participant: Equity Management, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Justin Garcia (Defendant); Participant: Opportunity Investments, LP. (Defendant); Participant: Samuel Rodgers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Opportunity Investments, LP. served on 11/05/2021 by Personal Service. $27.50. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Equity Management, Inc. served on 11/08/2021 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/03/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lagera, Christie; Rodgers, Samuel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lagera, Christie; Rodgers, Samuel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Christie Lagera in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 693388. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jacob O Partiyeli, retained for Samuel Rodgers . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jacob O Partiyeli, retained for Christie Lagera . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O