This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 09:15:31 (UTC).

Christian L. Johnson et al. vs California Department of Transportation

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Christian L Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against California Department of Transportation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0281

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Christian L.

Defendant

California Department of Transportation

Not Classified By Court

Johnson, Judge Hurl W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shepardson, John A.

Defendant Attorney

Sims, William Christopher

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Christian Johnson

Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Christian Johnson Re: Inability to Afford Paying for the cost of a Discovery Referee filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS050 Proof of Electronic Service

Proof of service filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Motion

Defendant California Department of Transportation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Compelling Answers to Deposition Questions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Separate Statement in Support; Declaration of Phillip S. Coonley; Proposed Order filed by California Department of Transportation. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS050 Proof of Electronic Service

Proof of service of MSC Brief filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Phillip S. O. Coonley in Support of Defendant California Department of Transportation's Motion for Order Compelling Answers to Deposition Questions filed by California Department of Transportation. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Opposition To Plaintiff's Memorandum

Defendant California Department of Transportation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Memorandum on Whether It Is Abuse of Discretion for the Court to Order a Discovery Referee for an Single Motion Involving Complex Legal Issues Affecting The Rights of the Parties filed by California Department of Transportation. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration of John A. Shepardson

Declaration of John A. Shepardson, ESQ Re: Oral Argument on Motion for Appointmnet of Referee; Objections, Including Exparte Communications with proposed referee filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS050 Proof of Electronic Service

Proof of service of Declaration of Plaintiff Christian Johnson Re: Inability to Afford Paying for the cost of a Discovery Referee by electronic on 06/11/2021 filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Reply

Defendant California Department of Transportation's Reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's memorandum of points and authorities in support of its motion for order compelling answers to deposition questions filed by California Department of Transportation. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: California Department of Transportation (Defendant); Participant: Christian L. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 07/09/2021 10:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff Christian L. Johnson's Objection to Exclusion of Marghuerite Johnson from MSC; Denial of Constitutional Rights to Due Process and Equal Protection filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Objection; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff Christian Johnson's Objection to Court Order Appointing General Reference Referee to Hear All Discovery Matters filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Objection; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: California Department of Transportation (Defendant); Participant: Christian L. Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Discovery Referee filed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service of Declaration of Plaintiff Christian Johnson Re: Inability to Afford Paying for the cost of a Discovery Referee by electronic on 06/11/2021 filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Plaintiff Christian Johnson Re: Inability to Afford Paying for the cost of a Discovery Referee filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to California Department of Transportation served on 02/05/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/05/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketAttorney, John A. Shepardson, retained for Christian L. Johnson . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Christian L.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Christian Johnson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 375250. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Christopher Sims