This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/17/2020 at 02:31:27 (UTC).

Cheyann Humphreys vs Cameron Gibson

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Cheyann Humphreys filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Cameron Gibson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************5372

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Humphreys, Cheyann

Defendant

Gibson, Cameron

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service filed by Humphreys, Cheyann. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Humphreys, Cheyann. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/09/2020 01:30 PM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Cheyann Humphreys (Plaintiff); Participant: Cameron Gibson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Cheyann Humphreys (Plaintiff); Participant: Cameron Gibson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Humphreys, Cheyann. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial (Possible Dismissal), set for 03/23/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Cameron Gibson served on 12/03/2019 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial Principle $ 2500.00 and Costs 50.00 scheduled on 03/09/2020 at 1:30 PM has been Continued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/09/2020 01:30 PM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principle $ 2500.00 and Costs 50.00, set for 03/09/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Humphreys, Cheyann. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Cheyann Humphreys in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 500765. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.